IL SB1516 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. In provisions governing the notice and response in a case involving types of charges other than those pertaining to real estate transactions, removes the requirement that a response be verified. Provides that the charging party and the respondent may each file a position statement and other materials with the Department of Human Rights regarding the charge of alleged discrimination within 60 days of receipt of the request by the Department (instead of "within 60 days of receipt of notice of the charge"). Provides that the Department may (instead of "shall") require the respondent to file a response to the allegations contained in the charge within 60 days of receipt of the notice of the charge. Provides that all allegations contained in the charge not timely denied by the respondent may (instead of "shall") be deemed admitted, unless the respondent states that it is without sufficient information to form a belief with respect to the allegation. Provides that within 30 days of receipt of the respondent's response, the complainant may file a reply to the response and may (instead of "shall") serve a copy of the reply on the respondent or the respondent's representative. Provides that a party may (instead of "shall have the right to") supplement the response or reply at any time that the investigation of the charge is pending. Makes similar changes in provisions governing the notice and response in other types of charges arising under the Act. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN RIGHTS-CHARGE PROCEDURES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harris
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77557A-102Amended CodeCitation Text
77557B-102Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback