IL SB1515 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that group or individual major medical accident and health insurance policies or managed care plans issued, amended, delivered, or renewed on or after the effective date of the Act must provide coverage and reimbursement for the treatment of mitochondrial disease. Provides that coverage shall include, but not be limited to, the use of vitamin and nutritional supplements, such as coenzyme Q10, vitamin E, vitamin C, vitamin B-1, vitamin B-2, vitamin K-1, and L-carnitine. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Services Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plan Act.
Title
INS CD-MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1515&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1515.htm |