IL SB1511 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Fair Act. Provides that income derived from the sale of advertising at the DuQuoin State Fair shall be deposited into the Illinois State Fair Fund (rather than the Agricultural Premium Fund). Provides that all revenues from the operation and use of any facilities at the DuQuoin State Fair and the DuQuoin State Fairgrounds shall be deposited in the Illinois State Fair Fund (rather than the Agricultural Premium Fund). Provides that all funds in the Illinois State Fair Fund shall be used by the Department of Agriculture in accordance with appropriation by the General Assembly for operation of the Illinois State Fair and the DuQuoin State Fair (rather than solely the Illinois State Fair). Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
AGRICULTURE-STATE FAIRS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Appropriations II |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 210 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 210 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1511&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1511.htm |