IL SB1502 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Right to Know Act. Provides that an operator of a commercial website or online service that collects personally identifiable information through the internet about individual customers residing in Illinois who use or visit its commercial website or online service shall notify those customers of certain specified information pertaining to its personal information sharing practices. Requires an operator to make available certain specified information upon disclosing a customer's personal information to a third party, and to provide an e-mail address or toll-free telephone number whereby customers may request or obtain that information. Provides for a right of action to customers whose rights are violated under the Act. Provides that any waiver of the provisions of the Act or any agreement that does not comply with the applicable provisions of the Act shall be void and unenforceable. Provides that no provision of the Act shall be construed to conflict with or apply to certain specified provisions of federal law or certain interactions with State or local government. Provides findings and purpose. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RIGHT TO KNOW ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-003-000
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-004-001
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback