IL SB1496 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that an individual taxpayer who (i) provides behind-the-wheel commercial driving instruction for at least 160 hours during the taxable year to an individual who holds a commercial learner's permit, (ii) accepts no compensation for the instruction, and (iii) holds a valid commercial driver's license in this State during the period of the instruction and has at least 6 months of commercial driving experience as of the first day that the taxpayer provides instruction is entitled to an income tax credit in an amount equal to $11,500 for each person who receives at least 160 hours of instruction from the taxpayer during the taxable year. Provides that the credit may not be carried forward or back, may not be refunded to the taxpayer, and may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-COMMERCIAL DRIVERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07SenateSession Sine Die
2023-03-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-02-14SenateAssigned to Revenue
2023-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Javier L. Cervantes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355240New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback