IL SB1493 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Project Labor Agreements Act. Provides for project labor agreements on public works projects totaling $15,000,000 or more in costs. Effective immediately.
Title
PROJECT LABOR AGREEMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Procurement |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 571 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1493&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1493.htm |