IL SB1483 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois School Student Records Act. Provides that a parent's or student's request to inspect and copy records under the Act must be granted no later than 5 business days (rather than 15 school days). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH RECORDS-TIMELINE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-06-06SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-009-001
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-000-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2017-05-29HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-29HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-05-24HouseRemains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-24HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 004-005-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Education; 012-000-000
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Education
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback