IL SB1480 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the School Districts of Innovation Act, the purpose of which is to grant school districts greater autonomy to implement innovative practices that improve student academic performance and benefit the whole child by removing obstacles that currently exist in law or rules. Provides that school districts seeking to obtain designation as a district of innovation from the State Superintendent of Education must establish an innovation committee to develop an innovation plan; sets forth provisions concerning the committee and plan. Contains provisions concerning statutory and regulatory mandates; innovation plan submission and designation; financial support for innovation planning; district of innovation review, renewal, and revocation; reporting; and rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH DISTRICTS OF INNOVATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback