IL SB1473 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Changes the date for when lotteries for determining the order certain petitions were received from within 9 days following the last day for petition filing to within 5 days following the last day for petition filing. Provides that 5 (rather than 7) days written notice of the time and place of the lottery shall be provided. Removes a requirement that the notice be sent to each organization of citizens entitled to have pollwatchers present. Provides that simultaneous filer candidate may be served with notice concerning the lottery. Makes similar changes in provisions concerning minor political parties. Provides that any campaign, party, or other organization or individual that engages in a vote by mail operation shall also provide the voter with a postage-paid, pre-addressed return envelope addressed only to appropriate local election authority. Provides that a permanent polling place for early voting must remain open through the end of the second day before election day (rather than through the end of the day before election day).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10510-6.2Amended CodeCitation Text
10519-3Amended CodeCitation Text
10519A-15Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback