IL SB1472 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Brownfields Redevelopment and Intermodal Promotion Act. Provides that the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Zone also includes Chicago Heights, Sauk Village, Ford Heights, and Country Club Hills. Provides that moneys in the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Fund may also be used for environmental remediation for State surplus property in Worth, Bloom, Rich, Bremen, Thornton, or Orland Township, if and only if an economic development project has been developed and approved by the municipality and the South Suburban Mayors and Managers Association. Provides that moneys in the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Zone Fund shall be held to fund eligible projects through 2026 (currently, 2021).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BROWNFIELDS-COUNTIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-04-10HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019
2019-03-21SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
206073-10Amended CodeCitation Text
206073-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback