IL SB1471 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Special Service Area Tax Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that a list of the names and addresses of the individuals and entities receiving a mailed notice of the public hearing concerning the establishment of a special service area shall be published at the time notice is given and shall be available at the public hearing. Provides that the following current provisions are limits on the concurrent exercise of home rule powers: a section providing that no member of a special service area commission may be an owner or board member of the service provider agency selected for that special service area, a section providing that no business owned by a member of a special service area commission or an employee of the municipality may provide goods or services in connection with the special service area, a section providing that at least one member of the special service area commission shall be an owner of homestead property located within the special service area, a section providing that special service area commissions may not establish a loan or line of credit in connection with the special service area, and a section providing that special service area commissions shall submit an audit of the special service area to the corporate authorities of the municipality at least annually. Contains provisions concerning the expiration of special service areas. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SPECIAL SERVICE
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 27-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 27-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 27-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 27-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 27-130 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 27-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 27-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1471&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1471.htm |