IL SB1470 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Conveyances Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Act's short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNCLAIMED PROP-COMMUNICATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 008-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76550.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback