IL SB1467 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that any person may use a crossbow to take any animal during the appropriate archery season. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CROSSBOW HUNTING-ARCHERY SEAS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-002-000
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Agriculture; 008-002-000
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Agriculture
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Agriculture
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Agriculture
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Agriculture
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback