IL SB1465 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that in addition to other purposes, moneys in the Illinois Fire Fighters' Memorial Fund shall be used to provide scholarships for graduate study, undergraduate study, or any other post-secondary education approved by the Illinois Firefighter Memorial Foundation (rather than only graduate study or undergraduate study) to children and spouses of fire fighters killed in the line of duty. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-FIRE FIGHTER FUND-EDU

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 008-000-000
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-634Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback