IL SB1462 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
ENTREPRENEUR LEARNER'S PERMIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 82 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0541 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Effective Date November 7, 2017 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses |
2017-11-07 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 082-027-000 |
2017-11-07 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-10-26 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2017-10-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 049-007-001 |
2017-10-25 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-003-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-028-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity Committee; 009-001-000 |
2017-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 008-003-000 |
2017-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |