IL SB1462 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Governor Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENTREPRENEUR LEARNER'S PERMIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Amendatory Veto
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-003-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-028-000
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity Committee; 009-001-000
2017-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 008-003-000
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-03-07SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1462&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1462.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1462eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1462enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1462gms.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1462sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1462ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1462ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1462_04262017_059000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1462_05302017_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1462_05312017_094000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback