IL SB1461 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0603
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0603
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Economic Development Area Tax Increment Allocation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
FILM PRODUCTION SERVICE-REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0603 |
2018-07-13 | Senate | Effective Date July 13, 2018 |
2018-07-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-001-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-12 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-07-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-07-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - July 1, 2017 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-06-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-06-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-000 |
2017-06-30 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-06-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Holmes |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 620 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |