IL SB1455 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the provisions of the Illinois Power Agency Act relating to the payments by retail customers of a utility for the purpose of recovering the utility's costs for procuring renewable energy credits shall not apply to an alternative retail electric supplier, or its customers, that operates a combined heat and power system in this State, or that has a corporate affiliate that operates a combined heat and power system in this State, and supplies electricity primarily to or for the benefit of certain specified facilities.
Title
UTILITY-RENEWABLE ENRGY CREDIT
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 16-115D | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1455&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1455.htm |