IL SB1453 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Personnel Code. Provides for the creation of a supported employees program by the Department of Central Management Services. Provides that the Director of Central Management Services shall develop and implement a supported employment program applying to all State agencies. Provides that the Director shall designate a liaison to work with the various State agencies and departments, and any funder or provider or both, in the implementation of a supported employment program. Provides that the Director, in consultation with the Secretary or Director of each State agency, shall establish job classifications for supported employees who may be appointed into the classifications without open competitive testing requirements. Provides that supported employees shall serve in a trial employment capacity for not less than 3, but no more than 12, months. Requires the Director to maintain a record of all individuals hired as supported employees, and submit an annual report to the General Assembly regarding the employment progress of supported employees, with recommendations for further legislative action. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERSONNEL-SUPPORTED EMPLOYEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 004-000-000
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Special Needs Services; by Voice Vote
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Special Needs Services
2017-08-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-08-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-08-07HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McCann
2017-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2017
2017-04-27SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2041517bNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback