IL SB1452 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations and reappropriations to the University of Illinois for various purposes, including for ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$ U OF I
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Appropriations II | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |