IL SB1446 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Deposit of State Moneys Act. Provides that the State Treasurer may, with the approval of the Governor, invest or reinvest (regardless of whether the price exceeds par) any State money in the treasury that is not needed for current expenditures due or about to become due, or any money in the State Treasury that has been set aside and held for the payment of the principal of and interest on any State bonds, in bonds issued by counties or municipal corporations of this State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEPOSIT STATE MONEY-INVESTMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-13 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-08SenateTotal Veto Stands
2017-10-24SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. David Koehler
2017-10-24SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto
2017-10-13SenateGovernor Vetoed
2017-08-18SenateSent to the Governor
2017-08-13SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-08-13SenateSenate Concurs
2017-08-13SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 038-018-000
2017-08-13Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-08-13SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-08-13SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-08-04SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Postponed Executive
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-05-29HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 065-046-000
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-29HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed 064-048-000
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-19HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 006-000-000
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1552022.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1446&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1446.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1446eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1446enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1446gms.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1446ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1446ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1446_04262017_056000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1446_05292017_016000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1446_05292017_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1446_08132017_006000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback