IL SB1444 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 relating to first degree murder. Adds and eliminates aggravating factors for which the death penalty may be imposed. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Eliminates provision that abolishes the sentence of death. Enacts the Capital Crimes Litigation Act of 2019. Provides that all unobligated and unexpended moneys remaining in the Death Penalty Abolition Fund on the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be transferred into the Capital Litigation Trust Fund. Amends the State Appellate Defender Act. Provides that in cases in which a death sentence is an authorized disposition, the State Appellate Defender shall provide trial counsel with legal assistance and the assistance of expert witnesses, investigators, and mitigation specialists from funds appropriated to the State Appellate Defender specifically for that purpose by the General Assembly. Provides that the Office of State Appellate Defender shall not be appointed to serve as trial counsel in capital cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REINSTATES DEATH SENTENCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
72059-1Amended CodeCitation Text
72510510Amended CodeCitation Text
7255113-3Amended CodeCitation Text
7255119-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback