IL SB1444 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Repeals provisions concerning arbitration of physical damage subrogation claims arising from auto damages in certain cases. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-ARBITRATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0439
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155143.24dRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback