IL SB1441 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that mandatory consecutive sentencing does not apply to a violation of a condition of electronic home monitoring under the Electronic Monitoring and Home Detention Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-CONSEC SENTENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-8-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback