IL SB1439 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois income Tax Act. Provides that, for purposes of the tax credit for instructional materials and supplies, the term "qualified school" also includes public institutions of higher education. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-INSTRUCTIONAL MATERIALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Faraci |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1439&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1439.htm |