IL SB1439 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Intergovernmental Missing Child Recovery Act of 1984. Provides that at the time of first contact with an individual making a report of a missing child who is under 18 years of age, the local law enforcement agency shall provide the individual with information, the contents of which shall be prepared by the Office of the Attorney General and posted on its website, that includes, but is not limited to, the following: (i) the 24-hour toll-free telephone numbers for the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children and the National Runaway Safeline; and (ii) a description of the services provided to families of missing children by the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children and the National Runaway Safeline. Provides that the information may be provided by the local law enforcement agency in a format that includes, but is not limited to, written materials for distribution or a posting on the official website of the local law enforcement agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MISSING CHILD RPT-HOTLINE INFO

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-24HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 013-000-000
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325407.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback