IL SB1438 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that, if none of the parties joined in good faith as defendants in a civil case are residents of this State, an action against those defendants may be commenced in this State only in the county in which the transaction out of which the cause of action arose, or some part of that transaction, occurred. Provides that a corporation organized under the laws of or authorized to do business in this State is a resident only of any county in which it has its registered office or other office (rather than being a resident of any county in which it does business). Makes similar changes regarding partnerships and voluntary unincorporated associations. Deletes language providing that an insurance company incorporated under the laws of or doing business in this State may be sued in any county in which one of the plaintiffs resides. Provides that, if none of the defendants in a civil action are residents of this State, and no part of the transaction out of which the action arose occurred in this State, the action must be dismissed for lack of proper venue. Makes other changes. Provides that the changes apply to causes of action filed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-VENUE CORPORATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-05SenateTo Subcommittee on Tort Reform
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73552-101Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-102Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-103Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-104Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback