IL SB1437 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Removes a provision requiring taxpayers who have been granted a disabled veterans standard homestead exemption to reapply on an annual basis. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-DISABLED VETERANS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-24HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2018-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-14HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-11HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback