IL SB1437 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Removes a provision requiring taxpayers who have been granted a disabled veterans standard homestead exemption to reapply on an annual basis. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-DISABLED VETERANS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-11HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback