IL SB1435 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to the amount paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year for the purpose of purchasing acoustical materials, other materials, labor, and professional services to soundproof a residential home located at an eligible address against aircraft noise generated by an airport governed by the provisions of the Permanent Noise Monitoring Act. Provides that the credit may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero; however, the credit may be carried forward. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-SOUNDPROOFING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-01-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-01-24SenateRe-assigned to Revenue
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355224New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback