IL SB1434 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Rental Purchase Agreement Occupation and Use Tax Act. Provides that an occupation tax is imposed upon persons engaged in this State in the business of renting merchandise under a rental-purchase agreement in Illinois, at the rate of 6.25% of the gross receipts received from such business. Provides that a corresponding use tax is imposed upon the privilege of using merchandise rented under a rental-purchase agreement in Illinois at the rate of 6.25% of the gross receipts received from such business. Provides for the imposition and collection of both taxes by the Department of Revenue, and for the filing of returns and the payment of taxes imposed under this Act. Provides the Department of Revenue with rulemaking authority. Amends the Use Tax Act and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RENTAL-PURCHASE TAX

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-018-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-004-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2017-05-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1434&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1434.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1434eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1434enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1434sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1434sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1434ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1434_05042017_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1434_05302017_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1434_05312017_093000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback