IL SB1433 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that a person who voluntarily self-discloses non-compliance to the Agency, of which the Agency had been unaware, is entitled to a 100% reduction in the portion of the penalty that is not based on the economic benefit of non-compliance if the regulated entity is a small entity as defined by a specified provision of the federal Small Business Regulatory Enforcement Fairness Act of 1996. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-SMALL ENTITY-NON-COMPLIANT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 015-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415542Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback