IL SB1430 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that it is unlawful for the Department of Transportation, its employees and its agents to knowingly misrepresent any facts in relation to the submission of plans, maps, specifications, costs of construction, bids, or contracts for any Department project.
Title
IDOT-MISREPRESENTATION-PROJECT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1430&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1430.htm |