IL SB1425 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-7)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-7)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Suicide Prevention, Education, and Treatment Act. Makes changes concerning the findings of the General Assembly. Creates the Office of Suicide Prevention within the Department of Public Health for the purpose of implementing the Act. Requires the Office of Suicide Prevention, in consultation with the Illinois Suicide Prevention Alliance, to submit an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly on the effectiveness of the activities and programs undertaken under the Illinois Suicide Prevention Strategic Plan that includes any recommendations for modification to Illinois law to enhance the effectiveness of the Plan (instead of an annual report by the Illinois Suicide Prevention Alliance). Changes what shall be contained in the Plan. Provides that the Office of Suicide Prevention (in addition to the Department) shall provide technical assistance to the Illinois Suicide Prevention Alliance and implement a general awareness and screening program. Provides that the program shall include an annual statewide suicide prevention conference. Removes provisions requiring the Department to establish 5 suicide prevention pilot programs relating to youth, elderly, special populations, high-risk populations, and professional caregivers. Provides that the Office of Suicide Prevention shall establish programs that are consistent with the Plan. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
IDPH-SUICIDE PREVENTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0331 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 53 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 53 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 53 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 53 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 53 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 53 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 53 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |