IL SB1425 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0885
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0885
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that a requirement that a State Police applicant have certain collegiate educational requirements is deemed to be satisfied if the applicant has been honorably discharged and has an Afghan or Iraqi campaign medal awarded after September 11, 2001 by one of the United States armed forces. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE POLICE--QUALIFICATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0885 | |
2010-03-11 | Effective Date March 11, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Governor Approved | |
2010-03-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-03-04 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 036-020-000 | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 036-020-000 | |
2010-03-04 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Consideration Postponed March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence Consideration Postponed 1, 2 | |
2010-01-13 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-01-13 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 007-003-001 | |
2010-01-13 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 007-003-001 | |
2010-01-13 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive | |
2010-01-13 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive | |
2010-01-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-01-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-01-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - January 13, 2010 | |
2010-01-12 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2010-01-12 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2010-01-12 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico | |
2010-01-12 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2010-01-12 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-011-000 | |
2010-01-12 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-01-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-01-12 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-01-11 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-01-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-01-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-01-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000 | |
2010-01-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-01-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2010-01-05 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-14 | Remains in State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-10-14 | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost State Government Administration Committee; 007-007-000 | |
2009-10-14 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-10-14 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-10-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-10-08 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-10-08 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009 | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-31 | First Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-26 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2009 | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio |