IL SB1424 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Small Donor Democracy Matching System for Fair Elections Act. Amends the Election Code. Creates a small donor campaign contribution matching system for candidates for the offices of Governor, Attorney General, State Comptroller, State Treasurer, Secretary of State, State Senator, and State Representative. Creates the Small Donor Democracy Matching Fund as a special fund in the State Treasury. Sets forth requirements for accessing the small donor matching system. Sets forth provisions for the funding of the matching contributions. Imposes limits on the access to matching funds. Allows the General Assembly to increase various amounts, subject to public referendum. Provides for penalties for violations of the provisions. Sets forth disclosure requirements. Creates the Campaign Finance Board within the State Board of Elections to implement the campaign contribution matching system. Includes severability provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-CONTRIBUTION MATCHING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-27 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-023-000 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Biss |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-004-000 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Verified |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Biss |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Biss |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-006-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Executive; 002-001-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 002-001-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9A-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9A-75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 9A heading | New Code | See Bill Text |