IL SB1424 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Small Donor Democracy Matching System for Fair Elections Act. Amends the Election Code. Creates a small donor campaign contribution matching system for candidates for the offices of Governor, Attorney General, State Comptroller, State Treasurer, Secretary of State, State Senator, and State Representative. Creates the Small Donor Democracy Matching Fund as a special Fund in the State Treasury. Sets forth requirements for accessing the small donor matching system. Sets forth provisions for the funding of the matching contributions. Imposes limits on the access to matching funds. Allows the General Assembly to increase various amounts, subject to public referendum. Provides for penalties for violations of the provisions. Sets forth disclosure requirements. Creates the Campaign Finance Board within the State Board of Elections to implement the campaign matching system. Amends the State Finance Act to make a conforming change. Includes severability provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-CONTRIBUTION MATCHING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 009-006-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Executive; 002-001-000
2017-03-15SenateReported Back To Executive; 002-001-000
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Election Law
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1059A-10New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-15New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-20New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-25New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-30New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-35New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-40New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-45New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-5New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-50New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-55New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-60New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-65New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-70New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-75New CodeSee Bill Text
105Art. 9A headingNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback