IL SB1423 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that a unit of local government, including a home rule unit, may not impose a tax, fee, on a firearm, firearm attachment, or firearm ammunition or other assessment other than the normal sales tax rate for goods. Provides that the provisions of any ordinance or resolution enacted before, on, or after the effective date of the bill by any municipal or county government that imposes a tax, fee, or other assessment other than the normal sales tax rate for goods on a firearm, firearm attachment, or firearm ammunition are invalid and all those existing ordinances and resolutions are void. Defines "sales tax". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM OWNERS ID-LOCAL REG

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306513.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback