IL SB1420 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0093
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Dead Animal Disposal Act. Provides that a non-profit organization or government entity that hosts a collection center to collect cooking grease or cooking oil from the public shall be exempt from licensure, fees, or reporting under the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEAD ANIMAL DISPOSAL-EXEMPTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0093
2017-08-11SenateEffective Date August 11, 2017
2017-08-11SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-16SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2017-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-02SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256103New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback