IL SB1415 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Revises the definition of "redevelopment project costs" by providing that redevelopment project costs for a redevelopment project area includes all or a portion of a taxing district's capital or operating costs (currently, only capital costs) resulting from the redevelopment project reasonably incurred (currently, necessarily incurred) or to be incurred within a taxing district as a result of the redevelopment plan and project (currently, incurred within a taxing district in furtherance of the objectives of the redevelopment plan and project). Removes a requirement that the municipality, by written agreement, accept and approve these costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-TIF REDEVELOPMENT PLAN

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-19HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-19HouseArrived in House
2017-05-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-002-000
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Holmes
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Holmes
2017-05-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-04SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2017-04-05SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback