IL SB1415 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Requires an arbitration panel to fully consider the statutory factors upon which it must base its findings, opinions, and orders during the dispute of a new or amended security labor agreement's wage rates or other employment conditions. Specifies the bases for the statutory factor of the unit of government's financial ability to meet costs.
Title
PUBLIC LABOR-ARBITRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-06 | To Labor Subcommittee on Special Issues | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-02-25 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-02-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Labor | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1415&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1415.htm |