IL SB1411 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Adds requirements and recommendations of the report created by the Sexual Assault Evidence Tracking and Reporting Commission issued on June 26, 2018 for implementation of the sexual assault evidence tracking system. Effective immediately.
Title
TRACK-SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0377 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 70 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 202 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |