IL SB1411 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sexual Assault Evidence Submission Act. Provides that the State Police shall by rule establish a sexual assault evidence tracking system that conforms to the recommendations made by the Sexual Assault Evidence Tracking and Reporting Commission in its report dated June 26, 2018. Provides that the Department of State Police shall design the criteria for the sexual assault evidence tracking system so that, to the extent reasonably possible, the system can use existing technologies and products. Provides that the sexual assault evidence tracking system shall be operational no later than than one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that a treatment hospital, a treatment hospital with approved pediatric transfer, an out-of-state hospital approved by the Department of Public Health to receive transfers of Illinois sexual assault survivors, or an approved pediatric health care facility must comply with rules relating to the collection and tracking of sexual assault evidence adopted by the Department of State Police. Provides for the operations of the sexual assault tracking system to be funded by appropriations from the State Crime Laboratory Fund, together with asset forfeiture and other funds appropriated by the General Assembly. Authorizes emergency rulemaking. Exempts information in the sexual assault evidence tracking system from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act, the Freedom of Information Act, the Sexual Assault Survivors Emergency Treatment Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRACK-SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-03-28HouseArrived in House
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
410705Amended CodeCitation Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
72520250New CodeSee Bill Text
73055-9-1.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback