IL SB1411 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 and the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that computers seized during the commission of indecent solicitation of a child, child pornography, aggravated child pornography, non-consensual dissemination of private sexual images, grooming, or traveling to meet a minor are forfeited and before there is to be a distribution of property or sale proceeds, the computers or monies seized and forfeited for those offenses may be used to support the training, equipment, or investigation needs of the child exploitation unit of the law enforcement agency. Provides that the computers may also be recommissioned for official use by the agency or destroyed. Provides that the law enforcement agency shall not be ordered by the court to return the computer to the defendant or his or her designee. Effective immediately.
Title
SEX OFFENSES-FORFEITURE
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 124B-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 124B-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 124B-500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 124B-505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1411&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1411.htm |