IL SB1410 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the curriculum for probationary police officers offered by all certified schools shall include courses on cyber-crimes and crimes committed with personal technology devices. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board may conduct or approve a training program in personal technology devices for law enforcement officers of local government agencies. Provides that the program shall train law enforcement officers to identify and investigate issues relating to crimes arising out of the use of personal technology devices on social media, internet communication, cell phone applications dealing with child exploitation, sending or receiving of sexually explicit messages, computer tampering, financial fraud, harassment, and stalking through electronic means. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE TRAINING-TECHNOLOGY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Police & First Responders Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5070510.22New CodeSee Bill Text
507057Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback