IL SB1409 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that the court shall not order the sealing of the records of arrests or charges not initiated by arrest which result in a conviction for financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability, aggravated identity theft against a person 60 years of age or older or a person with a disability, abuse or criminal neglect of a long term care facility resident, or criminal abuse or neglect of an elderly person or person with a disability. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person who commits the offense of financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability may be tried in any one of the following counties in which (1) any part of the offense occurred or (2) the victim or one of the victims reside. Provides that theft by deception from a person with a disability is a Class 2 felony. Provides that consent shall not be a defense to financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability if the accused knew or had reason to know that the elderly person or a person with a disability lacked capacity to consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCIAL EXPLOITATION ELDERLY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text
72051-6Amended CodeCitation Text
720516-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720516-1.3Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-56Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback