IL SB1407 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Hazardous Materials Workforce Training Act. Provides that the Department of Labor shall develop by rule a curriculum of approved advanced safety training for workers at high hazard facilities. Provides that an owner or operator, when contracting for the performance of construction work at the stationary source, shall require that its contractors and any subcontractors use a skilled and trained workforce to perform all onsite work within an apprenticeable occupation in the building and construction trades. Provides a penalty for violation of the Act. Creates the Illinois Hazardous Materials Workforce Training Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Makes corresponding changes in the State Finance Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HAZARDOUS MATERIALS WORKFORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Amendments in Senate (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2020-01-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2020-01-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2020-01-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2020-01-28HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2020-01-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-11-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-11-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-10-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-10-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019
2019-10-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-21HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-10-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-09-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-09-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2019-09-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-09-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-08-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-06-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-29HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2019-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2019-05-29HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2019-05-29HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-05-28HouseJudicial Note Filed
2019-05-27HousePension Note Filed
2019-05-27HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2019-05-27HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2019-05-27HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2019-05-27HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-001
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-24HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-24HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Labor & Commerce Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-05-24HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-017-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; 036-018-001; Koehler
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-23SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2019
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-005-000
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 014-002-000
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Executive
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback