IL SB1400 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish and maintain the Health Care Worker Registry of specified health care workers. Makes corresponding changes in the Nursing Home Care Act, MC/DD Act, and ID/DD Community Care Act, including deleting language requiring the Department to establish and maintain a health care worker registry in each of those Acts. Provides that the information contained in the Health Care Worker Registry shall include information from the registries established under the Nursing Home Care Act, MC/DD Act, and the ID/DD Community Care Act. Specifies that certain prohibitions on health care employers and long-term care facilities retaining individuals applies whether the individual is paid or is a volunteer. Adds specified offenses to a provision that prohibits health care employers and long-term care facilities from hiring a person who has been convicted of certain offenses. Makes other changes. Amends the Department of Human Services Act, Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act, and Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Confidentiality Act to make conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH CARE WORKER REGISTRY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0432 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1705 | 7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 3-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 3-206.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 3-206.02 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 46 | 3-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 46 | 3-206.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 46 | 3-206.02 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
210 | 47 | 3-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 47 | 3-206.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 47 | 3-206.02 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 46 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 46 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 46 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
740 | 110 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |