IL SB1399 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Drug Treatment Act. Provides that the drug court treatment program may also, subject to the approval of the Chief Judge of the Circuit, establish a program for electronic monitoring of juveniles with regard to drug-related and alcohol-related offenses. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV DRUG CT-ELEC MONITORING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. David B. Reis
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-29HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. David B. Reis
2017-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-29HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2017-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70541040New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback