IL SB1393 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to annually confer with the Illinois Community College Board to: (i) identify industries and occupations within this State that face workforce shortages; (ii) notify school districts of these identified industries and occupations; and (iii) approve industry-recognized certification programs designed to mitigate workforce shortages. Provides that beginning with the 2016-2017 school year, the State Board of Education shall annually award incentive grants to school districts for each pupil in the school district who obtained a diploma if the school district has an industry-recognized certification program and the pupil successfully completed the program. Further provides that if the funds appropriated in any fiscal year are insufficient to pay the full amount of the incentive grant, the State Board of Education shall prorate the amount of its payments among school districts eligible for an incentive grant. Effective July 1, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TECH ED INCENTIVE GRANT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-006-000
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2016-11-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Scott Drury
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury
2016-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-28HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2015-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-05-22HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
2015-05-19HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 016-000-000
2015-05-08HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
2015-05-04HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2015-04-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2015-04-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-04-29HouseFirst Reading
2015-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2015-04-24HouseArrived in House
2015-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2015-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2015-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-018-001
2015-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2015-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bennett
2015-04-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2015-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-003-000
2015-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2015-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
2015-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2015-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2015-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2015-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2015-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2015-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015
2015-03-25SenateSecond Reading
2015-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2015-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2015-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015
2015-03-24SenateDo Pass Education; 010-003-000
2015-03-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-03-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2015-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby
2015-03-17SenateAssigned to Education
2015-02-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-02-20SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-20SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.163New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback